5.a) picture wont move.

4.

a+b=c

(30x30) x (40x40) = (50x50)

1600 + 5625 = 2500

So the area is 2500.

5. A right triangle has side lengths of 40mm 75mm and 85mm

A) sketch the triangle. Draw a square on each sides.

B) What are the areas of the three squares?

(40x40) x (75x75) = (85 x 85)

1600 + 5625 = 7225

## 1 comments:

hey nikko good job on making a scribe post but you should add a video like thishttp://www.youtube.com/watch?v=L7EsAbDX6m8

and you should also change some of the colours on the writing anyways good job nikko

## Post a Comment